This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 01:33:01 (UTC).

NBA PROPERTIES CORP. VS JULIO ROCHA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 NBA PROPERTIES CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JULIO ROCHA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NBA Properties Corp.

Defendants

Rocha, Julio

All Others in Possession

Not Classified By Court

Property Address

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Giuliano, Nicole W

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/01/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/01/2021 - Complaint

Answer

11/04/2021 - Answer

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

11/02/2021 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

Order:

11/05/2021 - Order:

Service Returned

11/05/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/05/2021 - Service Returned

Certificate of Service

11/08/2021 - Certificate of Service

Motion for Default Judgment

11/15/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Default Final Judgment

11/17/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

12/01/2021 - Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted

12/22/2021 - Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rocha Julio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SHERIFF W/ MO #5302752775 Parties: Rocha Julio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32859:3646; Event Type: Event; Comments: & ORDER OF DEFAULT Parties: Rocha Julio; All Others in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rocha Julio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rocha Julio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AO 21-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690011AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.002139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2021REGISTER#:269CASHIER:TWYLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: All Others in Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rocha Julio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010069AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:GIULIANO, NICOLE WGIULIANO LAW P.A. 121 S. ORANGE AVENUE SUITE 1500ORLANDO FL 32801COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:11/02/2021REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY ADDRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL OTHERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Giuliano, Nicole W