This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 04:18:49 (UTC).

NAYAT SAN GIL VS AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 NAYAT SAN GIL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN GIL, NAYAT

Defendant

AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Torres, Nabila

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

03/16/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/16/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/16/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Appearance

02/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/13/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/30/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

01/16/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

12/30/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

12/28/2022 - Service Returned

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

12/22/2022 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

AgreedOrder

12/14/2022 - AgreedOrder

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

12/09/2022 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

12/09/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

12/07/2022 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Motion to Compel

12/06/2022 - Motion to Compel

Request for Production

12/01/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Extension of Time

11/03/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (STREAMLINED PATHWAY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: BILL HIGGOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: BILL HIGGOTT, 4-26-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090058AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:TORRES, NABILA1989 NW 88 CT STE 101DORAL FL 33172COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/14/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMERICAN BANKERS POLICY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: POLICY OF INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100039AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:TORRES, NABILA1989 NW 88 CT STE 101DORAL FL 33172COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/07/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less