This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 17:27:01 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS MARCY LYNN KASHANSKY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARCY LYNN KASHANSKY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage Llc

Defendants

Lynn Kashansky, Marcy

Kashansky, Marcy L

Babischkin, Marcy Lynn

Spencer, Gina L

Spencer, Gina

Babischkin, Gina L

Michael Babishchkin, Sean

Babischkin, Sean

Babischkin, Francey Anne

Babischkin, Francey A

United States Of America Acting through Secretary

Babischkin (Unknown Heirs), Sharon

Babischkin, Sharon Carol

Babischkin, Sharon C.

Babischkin, Sharon Marcus

Marcus (Deceased), Sharon Carol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

05/10/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/16/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Order Extending Time for

04/11/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

04/10/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

04/10/2023 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lynn Kashansky Marcy; Spencer Gina L; Michael Babishchkin Sean; Babischkin Francey Anne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Babischkin Francey Anne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 18.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 17.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200293AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33601:4619; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PREVIOUS CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less