This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 16:00:21 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS JOSE F ALONSO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOSE F ALONSO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

ALONSO, JOSE F

ALONSO, JESSICA Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/30/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Certificate of Possession of Note

11/30/2022 - Certificate of Possession of Note

Complaint

11/30/2022 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

12/01/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/02/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/02/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/07/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Final Disposition Document

01/12/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

01/12/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

01/14/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/14/2023 - Service Returned

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33541:4012; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: ALONSO JOSE F; ALONSO JESSICA Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: ALONSO JOSE F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: ALONSO JESSICA Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140016AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:12/07/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080173AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IANROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ, SCHNEID, CRANE & PARTNERS, PLBOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33488:268; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan