This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 18:04:33 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS ISIDRO SALGUERO GIRALDO ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ISIDRO SALGUERO GIRALDO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nationstar Mortgage Llc

Cooper, Mr

Defendants

Salguero Giraldo, Isidro

International Fidelity Insurance Company

United States Of America On Behalf Of Secretary Of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/28/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Email Notice:

06/28/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/28/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Lis Pendens

06/30/2022 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

06/30/2022 - Lis Pendens

Service Returned

07/22/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/22/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/22/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/22/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/22/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

07/26/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ISIDRO SALGUERO GIRALDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500028AMT PAID:$60.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE6$10.00$60.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2022REGISTER#:250CASHIER:ADONATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 Parties: United States Of America On Behalf Of Secretary Of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: UKNOWN SPOUSE OF ISIDRO SALGUERO Parties: Salguero Giraldo Isidro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040078AMT PAID:$924.00NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$924.00RECEIPT DATE:07/01/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33268:3005; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33268:3100; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cooper, Mr. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ