This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/10/2022 at 17:00:12 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS GEORCINVIL EDOUARD ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GEORCINVIL EDOUARD. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Champion Mortgage Company

Defendants

Edouard, Georcinvil

Georcinvil, Edouard

United States of America on behalf of Secretary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/23/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Notice:

11/23/2021 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/23/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Lis Pendens

11/24/2021 - Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

11/24/2021 - Lis Pendens

Motion for Extension of Time

12/25/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Summons Returned - No Service

12/29/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Return for Unknown Party

12/29/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

12/29/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

12/29/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/29/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Hearing-

01/05/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 02/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120002AMT PAID:$50.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE5$10.00$50.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:12/03/2021REGISTER#:212CASHIER:SFLOWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Edouard Georcinvil; United States of America on behalf of Secretary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050066AMT PAID:$1,911.00NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,911.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32874:3902; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Champion Mortgage Company is a litigant