This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/24/2022 at 02:27:38 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION, INC VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Water Restoration, Inc

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Delvar, Frantz Evens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roe, William

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/03/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/03/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Filing:

05/03/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

05/03/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/03/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/03/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process

06/21/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

07/02/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

07/11/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

08/02/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/25/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion to Dismiss

09/09/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Extension of Time

09/16/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

09/22/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/27/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2080065AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:AMERICAN EXPRESSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:208CASHIER:BELKISG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090040AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:ROE, WILLIAMLAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM J. ROW PA 17971 BISCAYNE BLVAVENTURA FL 33180COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Water Restoration Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant