This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/16/2022 at 07:26:13 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Water Restoration Inc

Assignors

Aliste, Ali

Olibrun, Gertha

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lampert, Hailey Felicia

Defendant Attorney

Rampal, Sylvie

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

06/29/2022 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Compliance

06/25/2022 - Notice of Compliance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/22/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order on Motion to Compel

06/13/2022 - Order on Motion to Compel

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/08/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion to Compel

06/06/2022 - Motion to Compel

Answer

06/02/2022 - Answer

Motion for Default

06/01/2022 - Motion for Default

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

05/18/2022 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM 05/18/2022 TO 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110098AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LAMPERT, HAILEY FELICIALAW OFFICES OF RINA FELD 240 W. PALMETTO PARK ROADBOCA RATON FL 33432COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100169AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:LAMPERT, HAILEY FELICIALAW OFFICES OF RINA FELD 240 W. PALMETTO PARK ROADBOCA RATON FL 33432COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: HWILSON@RINALFELDPA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $15000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less