This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/22/2022 at 03:54:32 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC VS ONE GROUP HOSPITALITY, INC (THE)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ONE GROUP HOSPITALITY, INC THE. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC

Defendant

ONE GROUP HOSPITALITY, INC (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexis E Altman

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/10/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/20/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Service

02/08/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Amended Complaint

02/14/2022 - Amended Complaint

Email Notice:

02/14/2022 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Filing:

03/07/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/24/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050010AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ALEXIS E ALTMAN757 NW 27TH AVE FL 3MIAMI FL 33125-3012COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/16/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: ONE GROUP HOSPITALITY INC (THE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ONE GROUP (THE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030044AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ALEXIS E ALTMAN757 NW 27TH AVE FL 3MIAMI FL 33125-3012COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960098AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:ALEXIS E ALTMAN757 NW 27TH AVE FL 3MIAMI FL 33125-3012COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:01/11/2022REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less