This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/14/2022 at 20:16:34 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESORATION INC VS PORTUGAL TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 NATIONAL WATER RESORATION INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PORTUGAL TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL WATER RESORATION INC

Defendant

PORTUGAL TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Korin, Jonathan

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/18/2021 - Complaint

Letter of Correspondence

11/18/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

Amended Complaint

12/08/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Appearance

02/11/2022 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090041AMT PAID:$0.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNTTENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$0.00RECEIPT DATE:11/19/2021REGISTER#:209CASHIER:SFLOWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JONATHAN KORIN, SQ., & PORTUGAL TOWERS CONDO ASSOC., CASE TRANSFERRED FROM CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less