This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 08:49:07 (UTC).

NATACHA GUERRIER ET AL VS MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 NATACHA GUERRIER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUERRIER, NATACHA

GUERRIER, ALICIA

Defendant

MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Funes, Alejandro D.

Defendant Attorney

Emery, Antwon Marcel

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

11/04/2021 - Amended Complaint

Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

08/10/2021 - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

Order:

10/21/2021 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

10/01/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Certificate of No Objections to Production

09/21/2021 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Notice of Production

09/17/2021 - Notice of Production

Motion to Dismiss

09/03/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Amended Complaint

08/25/2021 - Amended Complaint

Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

08/10/2021 - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

06/28/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Admissions

06/07/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/07/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion to Dismiss

06/07/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

01/21/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/17/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Indigency

12/09/2020 - Affidavit of Indigency

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/09/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISMISS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10-20-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Emery Antwon Marcel; MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Granting Motion to Dismiss; Book/Page: 32678:4311; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560003AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:FUNES, ALEJANDRO D. THE FUNES LAW FIRM PA 2857 SW 27TH AVENUE COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/16/2020 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580099AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:FUNES, ALEJANDRO D. THE FUNES LAW FIRM PA 2857 SW 27TH AVENUE COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/07/2020 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUERRIER NATACHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Funes, Alejandro D.