This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/17/2020 at 23:18:06 (UTC).

MYROSHNYCHENKO, INNA VS DAVIS, ALFIE AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 MYROSHNYCHENKO, INNA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVIS, ALFIE AL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MYROSHNYCHENKO, INNA

Respondent

DAVIS, ALFIE AL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vollger, Ollie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Davis Alfie Al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510033AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:VOLLGER, OLLIE 2465 NW 7TH ST MIAMI FL 33125-3150 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.