Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/01/2021 at 23:11:36 (UTC).

MVP EXOTIC CAR RENTALS A/A/O SHAKUR S. AUSTIN VS GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 MVP EXOTIC CAR RENTALS A/A/O SHAKUR S AUSTIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MVP EXOTIC CAR RENTALS A/A/O SHAKUR S. AUSTIN

Defendant

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruiz, Santino

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

03/02/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

03/01/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/10/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/07/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

12/04/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/04/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: H/03/15/2021 T/ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550072AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:RUIZ, SANTINO 782 NW 42ND AVE STE#528 MIAMI FL 33165 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2020 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2520195AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:RUIZ, SANTINO 782 NW 42ND AVE STE#528 MIAMI FL 33165 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/05/2020 REGISTER#:252CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MVP EXOTIC CAR RENTALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruiz, Santino