This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/31/2020 at 00:25:57 (UTC).

MULTIMED CARE, INC. VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 MULTIMED CARE, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MULTIMED CARE, INC.

NEIRA, IRENE R.

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Majid Vossoughi

Weir, Sylvia P, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Lasaga, Vivian, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Attorneys Fees

06/24/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Interrogatory

06/03/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion to Compel

05/23/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

05/23/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

04/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

04/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice:

04/01/2019 - Notice:

Request for Admissions

02/14/2019 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

01/07/2019 - Complaint

Notice:

02/10/2020 - Notice:

Notice:

01/09/2020 - Notice:

Motion to Compel

08/19/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/19/2019 - Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

08/19/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion for Sanctions

08/15/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion to Compel

08/15/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice:

08/05/2019 - Notice:

Notice:

08/05/2019 - Notice:

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JASON MORRIS LEVINE DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440119AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:MAJID VOSSOUGHI 3620 NW 7TH ST MIAMI FL 33125-4069 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$150.00 RECEIPT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3610043AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MAJID VOSSOUGHI 3620 NW 7TH ST MIAMI FL 33125-4069 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.