This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/14/2020 at 10:42:21 (UTC).

MONTIEL DIAZ, ERIKA MARIA VS MALDONADO MORENO, MAYNOR N

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 MONTIEL DIAZ, ERIKA MARIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MALDONADO MORENO, MAYNOR N. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Montiel Diaz, Erika Maria

Respondent

Maldonado Moreno, Maynor N

Minors

Maldonado, Melissa

Maldonado, Evolet

Maldonado Montel, Maynor Jose

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

02/05/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 19-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31810:3854; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Final Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Due Date:11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Completion of Parenting Class; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Montiel Diaz Erika Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Courses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Birth Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560025AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/10/2019 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:E323093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.