This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 05:42:55 (UTC).

MOLD RESTORATION SPECIALISTS VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MOLD RESTORATION SPECIALISTS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mold Restoration Specialists

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F Gonzalez

Defendant Attorney

Rampal, Sylvie

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/24/2021 - Statement of Claim

Notice:

11/24/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

11/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/24/2021 - Request for Production

Pre Trial Summons

12/09/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

12/15/2021 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/15/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice:

12/31/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

01/19/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

01/19/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-1 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND CHANGING CASE TYPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2820103AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2021REGISTER#:282CASHIER:YHOTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140135AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:ROBERT F GONZALEZ3403 NW 82 AVE SUITE 210MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rampal, Sylvie