This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 10:55:00 (UTC).

MOISTURE RID INC VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 MOISTURE RID INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moisture Rid Inc

Assignors

Jordan, Joann

Jordan, Kennely

Defendant

Universal Property & Casualty Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Jesse L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/01/2022 - Statement of Claim

20 Day Summons Issued

07/08/2022 - 20 Day Summons Issued

Notice of Appearance

07/27/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

07/27/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/27/2022 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090002AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/13/2022REGISTER#:209CASHIER:AT17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Universal Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080301AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $7706.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOISTURE RID INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ANGELA B. WOMACK-JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L