This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 17:14:41 (UTC).

MOISTURE RID INC VS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 MOISTURE RID INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moisture Rid Inc

Assignor

Moran, Catherine

Defendant

United Property & Casualty Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Jesse L

Defendant Attorney

Osgood, Nicole

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/21/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Change of Firm Name

05/27/2022 - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Appearance

06/06/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

06/06/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/08/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

06/13/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/13/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/13/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Extension of Time

06/13/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: United Property & Casualty Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160002AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2022REGISTER#:216CASHIER:GVIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130140AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:04/22/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $6588.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOISTURE RID INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ANGELA B. WOMACK-JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L