This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 18:03:05 (UTC).

MOISTURE RID, INC. VS PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 MOISTURE RID, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moisture Rid, Inc.

Assignors

JONES, CAREY

WRIGHT, LATRIVA

Defendant

People's Trust Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Jesse L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/02/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150080AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE L1700 E LAS OLAS BLVD #102FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/15/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190227AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE L1700 E LAS OLAS BLVD #102FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOISTURE RID INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ANGELA B. WOMACK-JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where Peoples Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'Hara, Jesse L