This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 19:04:10 (UTC).

MOISTURE RID INC VS AMERICAN SECURITY INS CO

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 MOISTURE RID INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moisture Rid Inc

Assignor

Estate Of Price Allen

Defendant

American Security Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Jesse L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

20 Day Summons Issued

05/11/2022 - 20 Day Summons Issued

Notice of Change of Firm Name

05/25/2022 - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Appearance

05/26/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

05/26/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

05/26/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

05/26/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

05/31/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/31/2022 - Request for Production

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

06/03/2022 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Settlement Agreement

06/15/2022 - Settlement Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650038AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/19/2022REGISTER#:265CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: American Security Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070099AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:O'HARA, JESSE LP.O BOX 16783PLANTATION FL 33318COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:04/23/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4961.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOISTURE RID INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ANGELA B. WOMACK-JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant