This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 10:48:13 (UTC).

MIRAIDA SANCHEZ VS SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 MIRAIDA SANCHEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, MIRAIDA

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F Gonzalez

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/17/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

11/17/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

11/17/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

11/17/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/21/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/07/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Motion for Extension of Time

12/21/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110096AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROBERT F GONZALEZ3403 NW 82 AVE SUITE 210MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/23/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100197AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ROBERT F GONZALEZ3403 NW 82 AVE SUITE 210MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/18/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLEADINGS@FLINSLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.