This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 04:39:33 (UTC).

MILTON CESAR RODRIGUES DOS SANTOS VS SKY GROUP USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 MILTON CESAR RODRIGUES DOS SANTOS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKY GROUP USA, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUES DOS SANTOS, MILTON CESAR

Defendant

SKY GROUP USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armenteros, Miguel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/14/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/14/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

10/05/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Final Judgment

10/20/2022 - Motion for Final Judgment

Notice of Hearing-

11/11/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Final Judgment by Judge

01/03/2023 - Final Judgment by Judge

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 3:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 33530:1174; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD Parties: SKY GROUP USA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 1/3/23 AT 3:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080133AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: SKY GROUP USA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030052AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ARMENTEROS, MIGUEL2525 PONCE DE LEON BLVD., SUITE 625CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6051COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/20/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Group USA, LLC is a litigant