This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/30/2023 at 03:26:45 (UTC).

MILLENNIUM RADIOLOGY, LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MILLENNIUM RADIOLOGY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLENNIUM RADIOLOGY, LLC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

ESCOBAR, CHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Scott B.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/31/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/31/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice:

01/31/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/31/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

01/31/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

01/31/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Filing:

02/13/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

04/14/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Letter of Correspondence

04/19/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIMETO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240004AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B.3377 SW 3 AVEMIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/03/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160029AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B.3377 SW 3 AVEMIAMI FL 33145COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less