Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/06/2021 at 15:13:17 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL ALFONSO (CO-PR), JR. ET AL VS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 MIGUEL ANGEL ALFONSO CO-PR , JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alfonso (Co-Pr), Miguel Angel, Jr

Torres (Co-Pr), Dana

Defendants

Stewart, Meghan

Enterprise Leasing Cormpany of Florida, LLC

Enterprise Rent-A-Car

EAN Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rudin, Steven

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

04/27/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/27/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/21/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

04/20/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

04/20/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/20/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

04/20/2021 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/20/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/20/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

04/15/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EAN Holdings LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Enterprise Leasing Cormpany of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Enterprise Leasing Cormpany of Florida LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EAN Holdings LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630205AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:RUDIN, STEVEN STEVEN RUDIN PA 9150 S DADELAND BLVD SUITE 1528 MIAMI FL 33156-7843 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/21/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF FLORIDA, LLC D//A ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAREAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620103AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:RUDIN, STEVEN STEVEN RUDIN PA 9150 S DADELAND BLVD SUITE 1528 MIAMI FL 33156-7843 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rudin, Steven