This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/13/2019 at 07:23:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ANASTASIA PANTELIDES

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANASTASIA PANTELIDES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

PANTELIDES, ANASTASIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fitzpatrick, Molly

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

09/03/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Voluntary Dismissal

07/16/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Summons Returned - No Service

05/31/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

05/09/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

04/23/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Summons Returned - No Service

03/05/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

02/04/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/30/2019 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

01/30/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31527:1872; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330021AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/13/2019 REGISTER#:333CASHIER:ROJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PANTELIDES ANASTASIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2780011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PANTELIDES ANASTASIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510136AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:FITZPATRICK, MOLLY PO BOX 290335 TAMPA FL 33687 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN