This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/06/2020 at 10:04:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS RODLFO A FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODLFO A FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

FERNANDEZ, RODLFO A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colleen E Lehmann (esq)

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

03/11/2020 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

02/26/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

02/14/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-3 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690117AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/27/2020 REGISTER#:269CASHIER:MPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FERNANDEZ RODLFO A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470058AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:COLLEEN E LEHMANN (ESQ) 4919 MEMORIAL HWY STE 135 TAMPA FL 33634-7510 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.