This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/08/2020 at 07:05:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS EDUARDO MONTENEGRO

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDUARDO MONTENEGRO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

MONTENEGRO, EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moehle, Kristina B

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

03/20/2020 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

03/02/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

02/13/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500028AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/02/2020 REGISTER#:250CASHIER:CARABEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MONTENEGRO EDUARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440066AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MOEHLE, KRISTINA B 887 DONALD ROSS ROAD JUNO BEACH FL 33408 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.