Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/28/2021 at 12:07:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS DAIMELYS TORRES

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAIMELYS TORRES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Torres, Daimelys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Obi, Valeria I, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

06/17/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/10/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2210017AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/22/2021 REGISTER#:221CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Torres Daimelys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690278AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:OBI, VALERIA I, ESQ PO BOX 290335 TAMPA FL 33687-0335 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:269CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA