This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/08/2023 at 14:47:08 (UTC).

MICHELL ESKARLETH PULIDO PEREZ VS PAOLA CAROLINA THOMPSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 MICHELL ESKARLETH PULIDO PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAOLA CAROLINA THOMPSON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULIDO PEREZ, MICHELL ESKARLETH

Defendants

THOMPSON, PAOLA CAROLINA

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benavides, Dayle Lopez

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/30/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/12/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/12/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: THOMPSON PAOLA CAROLINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080048AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:BENAVIDES, DAYLE LOPEZHICKEY LAW FIRM, P.A. 1401 BRICKELL AVENUE, SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080073AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BENAVIDES, DAYLE LOPEZHICKEY LAW FIRM, P.A. 1401 BRICKELL AVENUE, SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant