This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 12:50:10 (UTC).

MICHELET BIEN AIME VS MB REDEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 MICHELET BIEN AIME filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MB REDEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bien Aime, Michelet

Defendant

MB Redevelopment LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason S Remer

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/01/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/01/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/03/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

07/12/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

07/17/2022 - Order Extending Time for

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: (UNOPPOSED) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. Due Date: 08/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MB Redevelopment LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190138AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JASON S REMER44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200MIAMI FL 33130-6807COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/08/2022REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160125AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JASON S REMER44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200MIAMI FL 33130-6807COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Remer, Jason S