This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/06/2020 at 02:40:30 (UTC).

MICHEL, ODILON VS CONSTANTIN, JASLINE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 MICHEL, ODILON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CONSTANTIN, JASLINE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michel, Odilon

Respondent

Constantin, Jasline

Minors

Michel, Stanley

Michel, Wasler

Michel, Omarat

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Demesmin, Nathalie F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3-2-20 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Constantin Jasline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Constantin Jasline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Constantin Jasline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580035AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:DEMESMIN, NATHALIE F. 1125 NE 125 STREET STE 229 NORTH MIAMI FL 33161 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Petitioner - Child Custody Jurisdiction; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.