This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/06/2021 at 00:40:11 (UTC).

MICHAEL STARY VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 MICHAEL STARY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stary, Michael

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor A. Ruiz, Esq.

Defendant Attorneys

Battle, Dania

Carrillo, Katrina

 

Court Documents

Email Notice:

11/04/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

10/13/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Request for Production

10/07/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/07/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion to Compel

10/07/2021 - Motion to Compel

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

06/09/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Motion to Compel

05/26/2021 - Motion to Compel

AgreedOrder

05/11/2021 - AgreedOrder

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/06/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

04/15/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

04/05/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/09/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

02/18/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/18/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS: DANIA.BATTLE@CSKLEGAL.COM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEPOSITION DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Battle Dania; UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570383AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VICTOR A. RUIZ, ESQ. 815 PONCE DE LEON BLVD FL 3 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3056 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/10/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550262AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:VICTOR A. RUIZ, ESQ. 815 PONCE DE LEON BLVD FL 3 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3056 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrillo, Katrina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Battle, Dania