This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 00:58:51 (UTC).

MICHAEL BELL VS THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 MICHAEL BELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell, Michael

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan I Rotstein

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/04/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

08/11/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

08/11/2022 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/10/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

08/18/2022 - Email Notice:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/23/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/24/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

08/24/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/24/2022 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/30/2022 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Email Notice:

08/30/2022 - Email Notice:

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: L.BONNER@ROTSTEIN-SHIFFMAN.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: The Cincinnati Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050034AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN309 OAKRIDGE BLVDDAYTONA BEACH FL 32118-4072COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: L.BONNER@ROTSTEIN-SHIFFMAN.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MIACRTPLEADINGS@WICKERSMITH.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040150AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN309 OAKRIDGE BLVDDAYTONA BEACH FL 32118-4072COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/09/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac