This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 13:12:06 (UTC).

MIAMI RIVER HOLDINGS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CITY OF MIAMI, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 MIAMI RIVER HOLDINGS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Miami River Holdings, LLC, a Florida limited liability company

Appellee

City of Miami, a political subdivision of the State of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

William W. Riley

William W. Riley, Jr., Esq

Appellee Attorney

Greco, John A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Administrative Appeal

10/06/2021 - Notice of Administrative Appeal

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

10/07/2021 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

Notice of Appearance

10/14/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Text

10/19/2021 - Text

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

12/14/2021 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal

12/28/2021 - Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal

Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal

01/10/2022 - Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Recognizing Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Estimated Cost Received; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE Complete Date: 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940001AMT PAID:$281.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3063-ADMIN APPEAL CIRCU1$281.00$281.00TENDER TYPE:AMERICAN EXPRESSTENDER AMT:$281.00RECEIPT DATE:10/19/2021REGISTER#:294CASHIER:TANYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event; Comments: $281.00 FILING FEE DUE OCTOBER 22, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: JACQUELINE ABU-NASSAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Administrative Appeal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greco, John A