This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/08/2020 at 05:53:16 (UTC).

MIAMI O D PROPERTY (LLC) VS HOOD RICH ENTERTAINMENT INC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MIAMI O D PROPERTY LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOOD RICH ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miami O.D. Property (LLC)

Miami O D Property (LLC)

Defendant

Hood Rich Entertainment Inc

Not Classified By Court

Hood Rich Entertainment Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J L Fabrikant

Defendant Attorney

Barton S Strock

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

03/05/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

03/05/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Stipulation

03/05/2020 - Stipulation

Notice of Appearance

03/04/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31844:4827; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION Parties: Hood Rich Entertainment Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170027AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/18/2020 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hood Rich Entertainment Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3460031AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:J L FABRIKANT 125 N. 46 AVE. HOLLYWWOD FL 33021 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.