Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/16/2021 at 05:11:59 (UTC).

MIAMI GENERAL REHABILITATION INC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 MIAMI GENERAL REHABILITATION INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIAMI GENERAL REHABILITATION INC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Sanabria, Yara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yulexy Solis Garcia

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Marcus B.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike

05/26/2021 - Motion to Strike

Answer

05/21/2021 - Answer

Notice of Appearance

04/22/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/09/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

04/08/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/08/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

04/08/2021 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

04/08/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

04/08/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/08/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MIAMI GENERAL REHABILITATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650037AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/10/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2780116AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2021 REGISTER#:278CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIAMI GENERAL REHABILITATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griggs, Marcus B.