This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 12:44:39 (UTC).

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY VS. SIBYL ALEXANDER,JELANI KING ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 MIAMI-DADE COUNTY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SIBYL ALEXANDER,JELANI KING. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-20

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

ALEXANDER, SIBYL

KING, RENIKI

KING, JELANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk De Leon

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/03/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/03/2020 - Complaint

Answer

01/09/2020 - Answer

Certificate of Mailing

01/10/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

01/10/2020 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Service Returned

01/14/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/14/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/14/2020 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

01/22/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Mediators Report

01/22/2020 - Mediators Report

Stipulation

01/23/2020 - Stipulation

Order of Dismissal

01/23/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

01/23/2020 - Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies

Certificate of Mailing

01/24/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Court Registry Check Picked Up; Event Type: Event; Comments: CHECK HANDED TO ATTORNEY NEIL DE LEON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Court Registry Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: PUBLIC HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT C/O KIRK D. DE LEON, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Mailing; Event Type: Event; Comments: ODIS & ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Disburse Court Registry Monies; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31793:3983; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALEXANDER SIBYL; KING JELANI; KING RENIKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2530010AMT PAID:$49.44 NAME:SIBYL ALEXANDER 8322 NW 5 AVE MIAMI, FL33150 COMMENT:COURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1$48.00$48.00 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$1.44$1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2280053AMT PAID:$168.92 NAME:SIBYL ALEXANDER 8322 NW 5TH AVE MIAMI, FL 33150 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2106-COURT REGISTRY DEP1$164.00$164.00 2108-COURT REGISTRY FEE1$4.92$4.92 TENDER TYPE:CASH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILED @CALEB Parties: ALEXANDER SIBYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600001AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KIRK DE LEON 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2250 MIAMI FL 33130-6819 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090071AMT PAID:$30.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$60.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/06/2020 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ANDYM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALEXANDER SIBYL; KING JELANI; KING RENIKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALEXANDER SIBYL; KING JELANI; KING RENIKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami Dade County Fire Rescue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirk De Leon