This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/14/2020 at 08:23:56 (UTC).

MIAMI DADE COUNTY VS. MONICA LORE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MIAMI DADE COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONICA LORE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIAMI DADE COUNTY

Defendant

LORE, MONICA

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

03/09/2020 - Service Returned

Non-Military Affidavit

02/20/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Pre Trial Summons

02/14/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LORE MONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2840081AMT PAID:$185.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:GOVT CIVIL CTYTENDER AMT:$1,175.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LORE MONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less