This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/18/2022 at 00:55:11 (UTC).

MIAMI BUSINESS PARK, LLC VS PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 MIAMI BUSINESS PARK, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miami Business Park, LLC

Defendants

Pedro J Garcia, as Property Appraiser

Peter Cam, as Tax Collector

Jim Zingale, as Director DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynch, Samuel Brendan

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/25/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/25/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

07/25/2022 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/26/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/26/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/26/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/01/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

08/11/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

08/15/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/17/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/17/2022 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/06/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer

09/12/2022 - Answer

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

09/26/2022 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Peter Cam as Tax Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jim Zingale as Director DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Jim Zingale as Director DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020102AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:LYNCH, SAMUEL BRENDANPO BOX 2809ORLANDO FL 32802-2809COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030064AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:LYNCH, SAMUEL BRENDANPO BOX 2809ORLANDO FL 32802-2809COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/27/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less