This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 22:38:36 (UTC).

MERZ NORTH AMERICA INC. VS LEONARD HOCHSTEIN, M.D., P.A.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 MERZ NORTH AMERICA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEONARD HOCHSTEIN, M D , P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merz North America Inc.

Defendant

Leonard Hochstein, M.D., P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Batta, Ravi

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/08/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/11/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

09/02/2022 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/12/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Unavailability/absence

12/12/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion to Dismiss

02/08/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

03/10/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

05/09/2023 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Denying Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, LEONAR HOCHSTEIN, M.D.P.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Leonard Hochstein M.D. P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160013AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/20/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040102AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/12/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less