This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 00:23:23 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS VALTON BILLINGSLEY SR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALTON BILLINGSLEY SR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

BILLINGSLEY SR , VALTON

BILLINGSLEY APPLIANCE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/01/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/06/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/15/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/21/2023 - Service Returned

Notice:

03/27/2023 - Notice:

Motion to Amend

04/06/2023 - Motion to Amend

Amended Complaint

04/06/2023 - Amended Complaint

Answer

04/07/2023 - Answer

Response:

04/13/2023 - Response:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO AMEND AND TRANSFER 155544

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: & MOTION TO DISMISS Parties: BILLINGSLEY SRVALTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Amend; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF MAILING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: BILLINGSLEY SRVALTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060177AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2023REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100122AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less