This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 04:51:16 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS MYNOR RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MYNOR RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

RAMIREZ, MYNOR

RAMIREZ WELDING MG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sprechman, Steven B

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/08/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/08/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: RAMIREZ MYNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160287AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:SPRECHMAN, STEVEN B2775 SUNNY ISLES BLVD., SUITE 100MIAMI FL 33160COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220006AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:SPRECHMAN, STEVEN B2775 SUNNY ISLES BLVD., SUITE 100MIAMI FL 33160COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:03/11/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less