This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 13:47:06 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS CATALPA EXPRESS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CATALPA EXPRESS INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

Greenbox Capital

Defendants

CATALPA EXPRESS INC

MARKOV AS GUARANTOR, MARJAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/01/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/03/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: MARKOV AS GUARANTOR MARJAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MARKOV AS GUARANTOR MARJAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190159AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:02/04/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120145AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less