This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/27/2023 at 15:30:41 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS CANDIDA TOVAR

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANDIDA TOVAR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

TOVAR, CANDIDA

AFFORDABLE PROFESSIONAL ROOFING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/08/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/08/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Default

04/30/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Filing:

04/30/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Non-Military Affidavit

04/30/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Hearing-

05/11/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES 155632

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: TOVAR CANDIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160284AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220005AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:03/11/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less