This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/20/2023 at 13:39:31 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS BLUE MOON HOME REPAIR & JANITORIAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLUE MOON HOME REPAIR JANITORIAL LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

BLUE MOON HOME REPAIR & JANITORIAL LLC

ADONIS , NESLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/10/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

04/20/2023 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

05/10/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

05/16/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Non-Military Affidavit

05/12/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADONISNESLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADONISNESLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: BLUE MOON HOME REPAIR & JANITORIAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ADONISNESLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160283AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.002139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:03/17/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220007AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:03/11/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less