This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/18/2022 at 05:57:45 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS YONGYUTH NETHONGKOME

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YONGYUTH NETHONGKOME. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes-benz Financial Services Usa LLC

Defendant

Nethongkome, Yongyuth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/12/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/11/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/12/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2930101AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2022REGISTER#:293CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Nethongkome Yongyuth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970304AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/13/2021REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant