This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/20/2023 at 13:29:18 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS MICHAEL RAIGOSO

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL RAIGOSO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes-benz Financial Services Usa Llc

Defendant

Raigoso, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Perez, Anthony J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/22/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/24/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/17/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

03/16/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

03/16/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Raigoso Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Raigoso Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110232AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050652AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2023REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less