This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/03/2023 at 03:25:39 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS ELISA DOENS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELISA DOENS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercedes-benz Financial Services Usa Llc

Defendant

Doens, Elisa

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/27/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/27/2023 - Complaint

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/31/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/31/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Doens Elisa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130236AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110348AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:FAGEN, JESSICA JORAUSCH STURM 100 SECOND AVE S SUITE 3065ST. PETERSBURG FL 33701COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $30,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less