This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/27/2021 at 21:24:20 (UTC).

MELINA CESPEDES VS JUAN MUNILLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 MELINA CESPEDES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN MUNILLA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CESPEDES, MELINA

Defendants

MAGNUM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT, LLC

MUNILLA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT CORP.

MUNILLA, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meives, Mary Jo

Defendant Attorney

David A Lipkin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/01/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/18/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Request for Copies

06/15/2021 - Request for Copies

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/15/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice:

06/11/2021 - Notice:

Request for Copies

06/11/2021 - Request for Copies

Supplemental Request to Produce

04/19/2021 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/19/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

04/14/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/08/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/08/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/08/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

01/08/2021 - Email Notice:

Complaint

01/07/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFON8-4-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CHANGE OF PRIMARY ATTORNEY AND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGNUM CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MUNILLA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meives, Mary Jo