This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/11/2019 at 22:13:51 (UTC).

MEDICAL WELLNESS SERVICES, INC. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 MEDICAL WELLNESS SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDICAL WELLNESS SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Rondon Gonzalez, Jonathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart L Koenigsberg Esq

Defendant Attorneys

Michelle P. Babinksy, Esq

GIL, Jaclyn Marie

 

Court Documents

Order:

03/11/2019 - Order:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/07/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/13/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

02/13/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

01/30/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Production

01/30/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Production

01/30/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

01/30/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing:

01/24/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Pre Trial Summons

01/10/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/03/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2930058AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/10/2019 REGISTER#:293CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440114AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:STUART L KOENIGSBERG ESQ 8877 SW 131ST ST MIAMI FL 33176-5909 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.